MO HB814 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-06 - Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S)
Pending: Senate Insurance and Banking Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies which properties are eligible for financial institutions.
Title
Modifies which properties are eligible for financial institutions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - House: HB 814 HBs 3rd READ - INFORMAL (Y: 126 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: HB 814 (HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 86 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - House - House: HB 814 (HA 3) HBs PERFECTION - INFORMAL (Y: 86 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 38) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Insurance and Banking(S) |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2021-05-03 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 adopted AYES: 126 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2021-05-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-05-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-05-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-29 | House | Placed on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H) |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2021-04-27 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2 as amended, HA 3, HA 4, HA 5, HA 6 Adopted |
2021-04-27 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2021-04-27 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2021-04-27 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-02 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-01 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-01 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-17 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-04 | House | Referred: Financial Institutions(H) |
2021-01-14 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-13 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |