MO HB80 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred: Economic Development(H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-17 - Referred: Economic Development(H)
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit equal to the cost of labor and materials to construct or improve a data center
Title
Authorizes a tax credit equal to the cost of labor and materials to construct or improve a data center
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | House | Referred: Economic Development(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-19 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB80&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0080I.htm |