MO HB798 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Renames the Heroes Way Interstate Interchange Designation Program as the Heroes Way Interchange Designation Program and designates several memorial highways and bridges
Title
Renames the Heroes Way Interstate Interchange Designation Program as the Heroes Way Interchange Designation Program and designates several memorial highways and bridges
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-14 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-14 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-04-19 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-04-19 | Third Read and Passed (S) | |
2011-04-19 | SCS Adopted (S) | |
2011-04-14 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: Transportation (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-16 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |