MO HB785 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that any action to recover damages in a products liability claim must be commenced within 10 years after the date the product that caused the alleged damage was first placed into commerce
Title
Specifies that any action to recover damages in a products liability claim must be commenced within 10 years after the date the product that caused the alleged damage was first placed into commerce
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-04-11 | Referred: Judiciary (H) | |
2011-03-09 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB785&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0785I.htm |