MO HB769 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires any contractor who engages in the installation or service of fire sprinkler systems to register with the State Fire Marshal
Title
Requires any contractor who engages in the installation or service of fire sprinkler systems to register with the State Fire Marshal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Professional Registration and Licensing (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-07 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB769&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0769I.htm |