MO HB768 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to juvenile courts

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to juvenile courts

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-08HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-03-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-07HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-02-08HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2017-01-27HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-26HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback