MO HB763 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding enrollment options for students from school districts that have been declared unaccredited
Title
Changes the laws regarding enrollment options for students from school districts that have been declared unaccredited
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-10 | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education (H) | |
2011-03-07 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB763&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0763I.htm |