MO HB755 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-06 - Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases
Title
Modifies provisions regarding unlawful actions by persons knowingly infected with communicable diseases
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-06 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-03-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-03-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2021-02-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-02-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-02-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-02-17 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-01-28 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2021-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |