MO HB743 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-29 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Reauthorizes tax credits for a small business equal to the amount it pays as a guaranteed fee to specified federal entities and programs

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reauthorizes tax credits for a small business equal to the amount it pays as a guaranteed fee to specified federal entities and programs

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-16 - House - HB 743 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 112 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2015-04-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednsday, April 29, 2015, 12 noon or upon morning adjournment, Senate Lounge.
2015-04-21SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Jobs, Economic Development, and Local Government(S)
2015-04-16HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2015-04-16HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 112 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-16HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2015-04-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 6 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2015-04-16HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-04-16HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-04-15HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2015-04-14HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED
2015-04-14HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2015-03-16HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2015-03-12HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-03-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-03-10HouseReferred: Select Committee on Financial Institutions and Taxation(H)
2015-03-10HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2015-03-09HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2015-03-09HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2015-02-23HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2015-02-11HouseReferred: Banking(H)
2015-02-02HouseRead Second Time (H)
2015-01-29HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback