MO HB736 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-05 - Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Designates celebratory months for each month of the year
Title
Designates celebratory months for each month of the year
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Riggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-05 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-25 | House | Placed Back on Formal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-06 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2023-04-04 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-03 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-03 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-02-21 | House | Public Hearing Scheduled, Bill not Heard (H) |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Tourism(H) |
2023-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |