MO HB722 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding prohibited ordinances by political subdivisions
Title
Changes the laws regarding prohibited ordinances by political subdivisions
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Shaul [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-05-06 - House - HB 722 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 105 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 722 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 105 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 722 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - HB 722 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - HB 722 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - HB 722 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 722 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 105 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - House - HB 722 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 109 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - HB 722 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 114 N: 38 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - House - HB 722 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 109 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - HB 722 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 103 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2015-07-10 | House | Vetoed by Governor (G) |
2015-05-27 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2015-05-06 | House | House Message (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 105 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | House Adopts (H) - SS#2 AYES: 105 NOES: 48 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Taken Up |
2015-05-06 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-05-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-05-05 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SS#2 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Third Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 24 NOES: 10 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SS Adopted (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | SS Withdrawn (S) |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) - POINT OF ORDER NOT WELL TAKEN |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Point of Order (S) - Substitute goes beyond scope-taken under advisement |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Senate Substitute Offered (S) |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - Voted do pass |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 14, 2015, 2:00pm, Senate Committee Room 1 |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws and Pensions(S) |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 114 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 2 |
2015-03-19 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Perfected (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2015-03-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2015-03-02 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2015-02-26 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred: Select Committee on Utilities(H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Reported Do Pass with Amendments (H) - HCA 1 AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2015-02-24 | House | Voted Do Pass with Amendments (H) |
2015-02-24 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2015-02-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred: Energy and the Environment(H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |