MO HB718 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Hearing Cancelled (H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-29 - Hearing Cancelled (H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all hospitals and health care providers who receive MO HealthNet funding to provide health care services to the Department of Corrections
Title
Requires all hospitals and health care providers who receive MO HealthNet funding to provide health care services to the Department of Corrections
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-29 | House | Hearing Cancelled (H) |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2015-01-29 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-28 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB718&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0718I.PDF |