MO HB711 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding utilities
Title
Changes the laws regarding utilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-06 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-17 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-17 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-08 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Utilities (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |