MO HB691 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health and Mental Health Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Social Services to request a waiver to require certain MO HealthNet participants to be Missouri residents for 6 months before receiving benefits
Title
Requires the Department of Social Services to request a waiver to require certain MO HealthNet participants to be Missouri residents for 6 months before receiving benefits
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-08 | House | Referred: Health and Mental Health Policy(H) |
2017-01-24 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-23 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB691&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1489H.01I.pdf |