MO HB689 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-11 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Civil and Criminal Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates the Divided Highway Transportation Fund and designates how moneys in the fund must be disbursed
Title
Creates the Divided Highway Transportation Fund and designates how moneys in the fund must be disbursed
Sponsors
Rep. Bart Korman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-02-04 | House | Referred: Civil and Criminal Proceedings(H) |
2015-01-27 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-26 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB689&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0689I.PDF |