MO HB675 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-03 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes Cade's Law, requires the training of school employees in the care needed for students with diabetes, and establishes curriculum and certification requirements for school resource officers
Title
Establishes Cade's Law, requires the training of school employees in the care needed for students with diabetes, and establishes curriculum and certification requirements for school resource officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-03 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-03 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 34 |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - WEDNESDAY, MAY 8, 2013, 12:30PM, SCR 1 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Education(S) |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-30 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 19 |
2013-04-30 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-24 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2013-04-24 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2013-04-24 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-04-10 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2013-02-25 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |