MO HB648 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding individuals with disabilities
Title
Changes the laws regarding individuals with disabilities
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-10 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-10 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-09 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-05-09 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-09 | SS Withdrawn (S) | |
2011-05-09 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-05-02 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-02 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-04-27 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-22 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Second Read and Referred: General Laws (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Reported Do Pass by Consent (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Voted Do Pass - Consent (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-07 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services | |
2011-02-24 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-23 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |