MO HB641 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-14 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding controlled substances

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding controlled substances

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-14 Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
2011-07-14 Approved by Governor (G)
2011-05-26 Delivered to Governor
2011-05-26 Signed by President Pro Tem (S)
2011-05-26 Signed by House Speaker(H)
2011-05-10 Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2011-05-10 House Concurs (H)
2011-05-02 Reported to the House with... (S)
2011-05-02 Third Read and Passed (S)
2011-05-02 SCS Adopted (S)
2011-04-27 SCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2011-04-26 Executive Session Held (S)
2011-04-26 Public Hearing Held (S)
2011-04-18 Public Hearing Scheduled (S)
2011-04-14 Second Read and Referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence (S)
2011-04-07 Reported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2011-04-07 Third Read and Passed (H)
2011-04-04 Perfected with Amendments (H)
2011-04-04 HCS Adopted (H)
2011-03-28 Rules - Reported Do Pass (H)
2011-03-28 Rules - Voted Do Pass (H)
2011-03-28 Rules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-03-07 Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H)
2011-03-07 HCS Reported Do Pass (H)
2011-03-07 HCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2011-03-07 Executive Session Completed (H)
2011-03-01 Public Hearing Completed (H)
2011-02-24 Referred: General Laws (H)
2011-02-23 Read Second Time (H)
2011-02-22 Introduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback