MO HB61 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 16, 2013, 9:30AM, SCR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-15 - Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 16, 2013, 9:30AM, SCR 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the city council of the City of Farmington to also adopt or repeal any ordinance by submitting the proposed ordinance to the registered voters of the city
Title
Authorizes the city council of the City of Farmington to also adopt or repeal any ordinance by submitting the proposed ordinance to the registered voters of the city
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-15 | House | Executive Session Scheduled - THURSDAY, MAY 16, 2013, 9:30AM, SCR 1 |
2013-01-23 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-01-17 | House | Referred: Local Government(H) |
2013-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2013-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2012-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB61&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0061I.htm |