MO HB6 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-30 - Vetoed in Part by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on May 4 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-30 - Vetoed in Part by Governor (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Agriculture, Department of Natural Resources, and Department of Conservation
Title
Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Agriculture, Department of Natural Resources, and Department of Conservation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 6 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 142 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 6 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 6 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 122 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 6 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 137 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 6 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 122 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Vetoed in Part by Governor (G) |
2017-05-22 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2017-05-22 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2017-05-08 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-04 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 29 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 29 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-04 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-05-04 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 137 NOES: 16 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 142 NOES: 15 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-05-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-05-03 | House | House Distributes Conference Committee Report (H) |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-05-01 | House | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS BROWN, SATER, HEGEMAN, CURLS, HOLSMAN |
2017-05-01 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-27 | House | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FITZPATRICK, ALFERMAN, REDMON, BUTLER, DUNN |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Message (S) |
2017-04-27 | House | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Message (H) |
2017-04-26 | House | House Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS as amended |
2017-04-26 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SCS as amended AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Taken Up |
2017-04-24 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2017, 8:30am, SCR 2 |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-06 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 122 NOES: 29 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adaopted |
2017-04-04 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-04 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 2, HA 3 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | Laid Over (H) - HA 1 adopted |
2017-04-04 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-04 | House | SEE COMMENTS - Six (6) hours total debate on perfection, pursuant to HR 1400 |
2017-04-03 | House | Laid Over (H) |
2017-04-03 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-29 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-28 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-23 | House | Referred: Budget(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |