MO HB59 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes provisions to protect personal information of active and retired first responders

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes provisions to protect personal information of active and retired first responders

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-22 - House - House: HB 59 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-04SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2021-05-04SenateSenate Substitute Offered (S)
2021-05-04SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2021-05-03SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2021-04-28SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2021-04-28SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-04-26SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 28, 9:00 a.m., Joint Committee Room
2021-04-20SenateReferred: Governmental Accountability and Fiscal Oversight(S)
2021-04-15SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2021-04-12SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2021-04-12SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-03-29SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-03-25SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 29, 1:30 pm, SCR 1
2021-03-22SenateHouse Message (H)
2021-03-11SenateSecond read and referred: Judiciary and Civil and Criminal Jurisprudence(S)
2021-02-22HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-02-22HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 2
2021-02-22HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-02-17HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 to HA 1, HA 1 AS AMENDED ADOPTED
2021-02-17HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-02-17HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-02-17HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-02-08HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-08HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-08HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-02-03HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-02-03HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-02-02HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-02-02HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-26HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-14HouseReferred: Public Safety(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-01HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB59&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0592H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0592H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0592H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0592S.04C.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0592H03.03H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0592H03.04H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0592H03.05H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0592H03.09H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0592H03.15H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0592H03.17H.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0592H03.18H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0059I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0592H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0059C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0592H.03C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0592H.03P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0059P.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0592S.04C.ORG.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/027.004.pdf

Bill Comments 750

feedback