MO HB585 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-06 - Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the "Taxpayer Protection Act."
Title
Establishes the "Taxpayer Protection Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House: HB 585 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 148 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-06 | Senate | Second read and referred: Professional Registration(S) |
2019-05-02 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-05-02 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 148 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 1 |
2019-05-02 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-30 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2, HA 3 adopted |
2019-04-30 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-04-30 | House | Taken Up |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on the Informal Perfection Calendar (H) |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-11 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-11 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2019-04-03 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 8 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-04-02 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2019-01-17 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-16 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |