MO HB564 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-20 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes procedures for the distribution of moneys received from mining royalties on federal land within the state
Title
Establishes procedures for the distribution of moneys received from mining royalties on federal land within the state
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-19 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-19 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2021-04-13 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 14 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2021-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2021-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2021-02-11 | House | Referred: Conservation and Natural Resources(H) |
2021-01-07 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2021-01-06 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2020-12-18 | House | Prefiled (H) |