MO HB555 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Legislative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Safe Schools Act
Title
Establishes the Safe Schools Act
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Ross [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-04-19 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-04-18 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-14 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |