MO HB555 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 12 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health care
Title
Changes the laws regarding health care
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-12 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-12 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-13 | House Concurs (H) | |
2011-05-13 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-13 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-05-13 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-13 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-13 | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) | |
2011-05-13 | Placed on Informal Calendar | |
2011-05-12 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Referred: Ways and Means and Fiscal Oversight (S) | |
2011-05-11 | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-10 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-04-26 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-18 | Second Read and Referred: Health, Mental Health, Seniors, and Familiest (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-14 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Referred: Fiscal Review (H) | |
2011-04-13 | Perfected with Amendments (H) | |
2011-04-13 | HCS Adopted (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-15 | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-14 | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-14 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-07 | Executive Session - No Action Taken | |
2011-03-02 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Disability Services | |
2011-02-21 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |