MO HB552 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Voted Do Pass (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires political subdivisions receiving more than 20% of their annual general operating revenues from traffic fines on state highways to send the revenues in excess of the threshold to the state school system
Title
Requires political subdivisions receiving more than 20% of their annual general operating revenues from traffic fines on state highways to send the revenues in excess of the threshold to the state school system
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-18 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-04-18 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-04-10 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred: Judiciary(H) |
2013-02-13 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB552&year=2013&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills131/biltxt/intro/HB0552I.htm |