MO HB550 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Litigation Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-13 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Special Committee on Litigation Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Human Rights Act and employment discrimination
Title
Changes the laws regarding the Missouri Human Rights Act and employment discrimination
Sponsors
Rep. Joe McGaugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Litigation Reform(H) |
2017-01-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-10 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB550&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1110H.01I.pdf |