MO HB55 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-15 - Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
Pending: House Rules - Administrative Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a tax credit for donations to a homeless shelter
Title
Authorizes a tax credit for donations to a homeless shelter
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-15 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-13 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-13 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred: Ways and Means(H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2016-12-01 | House | Prefiled (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB55&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0460H.01I.pdf |