MO HB547 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-19 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Health Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding health insurance premium rate reviews by the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Title
Changes the laws regarding health insurance premium rate reviews by the Department of Insurance, Financial Institutions and Professional Registration
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-19 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred: Health Insurance (H) | |
2011-02-17 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-16 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB547&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0547I.htm |