MO HB533 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-05 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding firearms
Title
Changes the laws regarding firearms
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-05 | House | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-05 | House | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-30 | House | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-17 | House | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 125 NOES: 27 |
2013-05-17 | House | House Concurs (H) - SCS AS AMENDED ADOPTED AYES: 126 NOES: 29 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Reported to the House with... (H) - SCS AS AMENDED |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3 ADOPTED AYES: 26 NOES: 7 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | SCS Adopted (S) |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - SCS VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, April 23, 2013, 1:30 p.m., SCR 1 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate General Laws(S) |
2013-04-15 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-11 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 126 NOES: 25 |
2013-04-11 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-09 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 ADOPTED |
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-28 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-26 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-05 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2013-02-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |