MO HB514 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-12 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-12 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the law regarding fire protection districts
Title
Changes the law regarding fire protection districts
Sponsors
Rep. Don Mayhew [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 5 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-04-12 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-04-12 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-04-06 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2023-03-23 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 13 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2023-03-22 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2023-03-22 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2023-03-08 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred: Government Efficiency and Downsizing(H) |
2023-01-05 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2023-01-04 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2022-12-28 | House | Prefiled (H) |