MO HB510 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a limited liability company to establish a designated series of members, managers, and company interests having separate rights and duties regarding specified property
Title
Allows a limited liability company to establish a designated series of members, managers, and company interests having separate rights and duties regarding specified property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Senate | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) |
2013-07-01 | Senate | Approved by Governor (G) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Delivered to Governor |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Signed by House Speaker(H) |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 32 |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Taken Up for Third Reading (S) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Informal Calendar |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass (S) |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) - VOTED DO PASS |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 30, 2013, UPON MORNING RECESS OR ADJOURNMENT, SCR 1 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S) |
2013-04-22 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 156 NOES: 1 |
2013-04-18 | House | Taken Up for Third Reading (H) |
2013-04-17 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1 ADOPTED |
2013-04-17 | House | Taken Up for Perfection (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-14 | House | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred: Rules(H) |
2013-03-12 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2013-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred: Special Standing Committee on Small Business(H) |
2013-02-11 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2013-02-07 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |