MO HB488 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-01 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires driver's license examinations to only be administered in English and establishes a $15 fee for an applicant to take the written portion of the examination
Title
Requires driver's license examinations to only be administered in English and establishes a $15 fee for an applicant to take the written portion of the examination
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-24 | Referred: Transportation (H) | |
2011-02-14 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB488&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0488I.htm |