MO HB466 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-09 - Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows structured family care giving as a covered service under MO HealthNet, subject to the approval of federal waivers.
Title
Allows structured family care giving as a covered service under MO HealthNet, subject to the approval of federal waivers.
Sponsors
Rep. David Wood [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - House: HB 466 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: HB 466 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2019-03-12 - House - House: HB 466 (*HA 1) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 39 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-09 | Senate | Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Executive Session Scheduled - Thursday, May 9, 2019, 9:30am, Bingham Conference Room |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Referred: Fiscal Oversight(S) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | SCS Reported Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | SCS Voted Do Pass (S) |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Executive Session Held (S) |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 17, 2019, 8 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Hearing Cancelled (S) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Wednesday, April 10, 2019, 8:00 a.m., Senate Lounge |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second read and referred: Seniors, Families and Children(S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2019-03-14 | House | Third Read and Passed (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Taken Up |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-03-14 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred: Fiscal Review(H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Perfected (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2019-03-12 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2019-03-12 | House | Taken Up |
2019-02-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-28 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-28 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-21 | House | Referred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H) |
2019-02-21 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2019-02-20 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2019-02-20 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2019-02-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2019-01-23 | House | Referred: Special Committee on Aging(H) |
2019-01-10 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2019-01-09 | House | Read First Time (H) |
2019-01-08 | House | Prefiled (H) |