MO HB465 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-06 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Elementary And Secondary Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Raises the minimum teacher salary for the 2018-19 school year, subject to appropriation
Title
Raises the minimum teacher salary for the 2018-19 school year, subject to appropriation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB465&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1026H.01I.pdf |