MO HB46 | 2020 | 1st Extraordinary Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 2 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-09-16 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies the power of the City of St. Louis to impose residency requirements on certain municipal personnel

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies the power of the City of St. Louis to impose residency requirements on certain municipal personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-02 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 46 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 117 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: HB 46 HBs FOR THIRD READING - INFORMAL (Y: 113 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 46 (*HA 3) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 39 N: 93 NV: 2 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 46 (HA 5) HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 96 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - House - House: HB 46 HBs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 94 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-16SenateDelivered to Governor
2020-09-16SenateSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2020-09-16SenateSigned by House Speaker(H)
2020-09-09SenateSenate Message (S)
2020-09-02SenateEmergency Clause Adopted on Truly Agreed to Bill - AYES: 25 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2020-09-02SenateTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 25 NOES: 5 PRESENT: 0
2020-09-02SenateTaken Up for Third Reading (S)
2020-09-01SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2020-09-01SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2020-09-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2020-09-01SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2020-08-31SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - 11:00 a.m., Tuesday, September 1, 2020, Senate Chamber
2020-08-31SenateSecond read and referred: Transportation, Infrastructure and Public Safety(S)
2020-08-28HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2020-08-25HouseEmergency Clause Adopted (H) - AYES: 113 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 35 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-25HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2020-08-25HousePlaced on the Informal Third Reading Calendar (H)
2020-08-24HousePerfected (H)
2020-08-24HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2020-08-24HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2020-08-24HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2020-08-18HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-18HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-18HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-17HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2020-08-17HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 12 NOES: 4 PRESENT: 0
2020-08-17HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2020-08-17HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2020-08-17HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2020-08-12HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2020-08-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2020-08-07HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB46&year=2020&code=S1
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5857H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5857H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5857H.02P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/hlrbillspdf/5857H.02T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/008.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/008.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/008.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/009.008.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills203/rollcalls/009.007.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/20info/Journals/T1Day11090248-75.pdf#50

Bill Comments

feedback