MO HB458 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-11 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Title
Changes the laws regarding agriculture
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-11 | Delivered to Secretary of State (G) | |
2011-07-11 | Approved by Governor (G) | |
2011-05-26 | Delivered to Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by President Pro Tem (S) | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by House Speaker(H) | |
2011-05-13 | Truly Agreed To and Finally Passed | |
2011-05-13 | Senate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2011-05-13 | Senate Submits Conference Committee Report (S) | |
2011-05-13 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-05-13 | House Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2011-05-12 | House Submits Conference Committee Report (H) | |
2011-05-12 | House Conference Committee Appointed (H) | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Conference Committee Appointed (S) | |
2011-05-12 | Senate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S) | |
2011-05-11 | House Refuses to Concur, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference | |
2011-05-11 | Reported to the House with... (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (S) | |
2011-05-11 | SS Adopted (S) | |
2011-05-11 | Senate Substitute Offered (S) | |
2011-05-05 | Reported Do Pass (S) | |
2011-05-04 | Executive Session Held (S) | |
2011-05-04 | Public Hearing Held (S) | |
2011-05-03 | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) | |
2011-04-14 | Second Read and Referred: Agriculture, Food Production, and Outdoor Resources (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) | |
2011-04-07 | Third Read and Passed (H) | |
2011-04-04 | Perfected (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-28 | Rules - Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Referred: Rules - Pursuant to Rule 25(32)(f) (H) | |
2011-03-02 | Reported Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Voted Do Pass (H) | |
2011-03-01 | Executive Session Completed (H) | |
2011-02-22 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred: Emerging Issues in Animal Agriculture (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |