MO HB449 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-06 - Motion to Do Pass Failed (H)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires any statewide athletic organization with a public school district as a member to provide coaches for practices at the state fair
Title
Requires any statewide athletic organization with a public school district as a member to provide coaches for practices at the state fair
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-06 | House | Motion to Do Pass Failed (H) |
2017-03-06 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-01-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-12 | House | Referred: Elementary and Secondary Education(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB449&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0125H.02I.pdf |