MO HB447 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to coroners

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to coroners

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - House: HB 447 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 134 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - House: HB 447 HBs WITH SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 136 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: HB 447 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 150 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-12HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2019-07-12HouseVetoed by Governor (G)
2019-05-29HouseDelivered to Governor
2019-05-29HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2019-05-29HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2019-05-16HouseHouse Message (H)
2019-05-16HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed
2019-05-16HouseHouse Adopts (H) - SCS as amended
2019-05-16HouseTaken Up
2019-05-15HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-05-15HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-05-15HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-05-15HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2019-05-15SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS as amended
2019-05-13SenateThird Read and Passed (S)
2019-05-13SenateTaken Up
2019-05-13SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-05-13SenateVoted Do Pass (S)
2019-05-13SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-05-10SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Monday, May 13, 2019, 1 p.m., Bingham Conference Room
2019-05-09SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-05-09SenateSCS Adopted (S) - SA 1, SA 2, SA 3, SA 4
2019-05-09SenateTaken Up
2019-04-25SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-25SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-04-24SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, April 25, 2019, 9:00am, Bingham Conference Room
2019-04-23SenateReferred: Fiscal Oversight(S)
2019-04-18SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2019-04-01SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2019-04-01SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2019-03-25SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2019-03-21SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Monday, March 25, 2019, 2:15 p.m. or upon afternoon recess, Senate Lounge
2019-03-07SenateSecond read and referred: Professional Registration(S)
2019-02-18HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2019-02-18HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 150 NOES: 6 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-18HouseTaken Up
2019-02-13HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 2 adopted
2019-02-13HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2019-02-13HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2019-02-13HouseTaken Up
2019-02-11HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-11HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-11HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-02-06HouseReferred: Rules - Administrative Oversight(H)
2019-02-06HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 16 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2019-02-05HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2019-02-05HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2019-01-29HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2019-01-16HouseReferred: Judiciary(H)
2019-01-10HouseRead Second Time (H)
2019-01-09HouseRead First Time (H)
2019-01-04HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback