MO HB445 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Corrections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits any person from smoking or using tobacco products in any area or on the grounds of a state correctional facility
Title
Prohibits any person from smoking or using tobacco products in any area or on the grounds of a state correctional facility
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred: Corrections (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-09 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB445&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0445I.htm |