MO HB438 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-07 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to the detaining of incapacitated or intoxicated persons by law enforcement officers
Title
Modifies provisions relating to the detaining of incapacitated or intoxicated persons by law enforcement officers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB438&year=2017&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/1184H.01I.pdf |