MO HB436 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-28 - Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Amends laws relating to corporate security advisors
Title
Amends laws relating to corporate security advisors
Sponsors
Rep. Justin Hill [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 11 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-02-22 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-02-21 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-02-21 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-07 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |