MO HB433 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to sales of intoxicating liquor

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to sales of intoxicating liquor

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 433 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-27SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 2, 2017, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge
2017-04-24SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Economic Development(S)
2017-04-13HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-04-13HouseThird Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 adopted AYES: 91 NOES: 64 PRESENT: 2
2017-04-13HouseTaken Up
2017-04-11HousePerfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2 as amended, HA 3 adopted
2017-04-11HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-04-11HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-04-11HouseTaken Up
2017-03-29HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-03-08HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2017-03-08HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-07HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-07HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-28HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-02-16HouseReferred: General Laws(H)
2017-01-09HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback