MO HB433 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Public Hearing Held (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies provisions relating to sales of intoxicating liquor
Title
Modifies provisions relating to sales of intoxicating liquor
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-13 - House - House: HB 433 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 64 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Public Hearing Held (S) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Public Hearing Scheduled (S) - Tuesday, May 2, 2017, 12:00pm, Senate Lounge |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Second read and referred: Senate Economic Development(S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported to the Senate and First Read (S) |
2017-04-13 | House | Third Read and Passed with Amendments (H) - HPA 1 adopted AYES: 91 NOES: 64 PRESENT: 2 |
2017-04-13 | House | Taken Up |
2017-04-11 | House | Perfected with Amendments (H) - HA 1, HA 1 to HA 2, HA 2 as amended, HA 3 adopted |
2017-04-11 | House | HCS Adopted (H) |
2017-04-11 | House | Title of Bill - Agreed To |
2017-04-11 | House | Taken Up |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-27 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H) |
2017-03-08 | House | HCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 3 PRESENT: 0 |
2017-03-07 | House | HCS Voted Do Pass (H) |
2017-03-07 | House | Executive Session Completed (H) |
2017-02-28 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred: General Laws(H) |
2017-01-09 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2017-01-05 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |