MO HB429 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 27 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-04 - SCS Voted Do Pass (S)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizes an income tax deduction for the provision of child foster care services

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes an income tax deduction for the provision of child foster care services

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House: HB 429 HBs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-04SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2021-03-04SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2021-03-03SenateExecutive Session Scheduled - Thursday, March 4, 2021, Senate Lounge, 8:00am
2021-02-25SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2021-02-23SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - Thursday, February 25, 2021. 8:30am, Senate Lounge
2021-02-02SenateSecond read and referred: Ways and Means(S)
2021-01-27HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2021-01-27HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 149 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-01-27HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2021-01-27HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 7 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-01-27HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-01-27HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-26HouseReferred: Fiscal Review(H)
2021-01-25HousePerfected (H)
2021-01-25HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2021-01-25HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2021-01-25HouseTaken Up for Perfection (H)
2021-01-14HouseReported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 10 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-01-14HouseVoted Do Pass (H)
2021-01-14HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-13HouseReferred: Rules - Legislative Oversight(H)
2021-01-13HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 9 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2021-01-12HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2021-01-12HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2021-01-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2021-01-07HouseReferred: Children and Families(H)
2021-01-07HouseRead Second Time (H)
2021-01-06HouseRead First Time (H)
2020-12-10HousePrefiled (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB429&year=2021&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0318H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0318H.02C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/hlrbillspdf/0318H.02P.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/amendpdf/0318H02.04H.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0429I.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0318H.01I.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0429C.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0318H.02C.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/fiscal/fispdf/0318H.02P.ORG.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/sumpdf/HB0429P.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills211/rollcalls/011.002.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback