MO HB429 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-12 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Professional Registration And Licensing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies provisions relating to physician referrals to physical therapists

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Modifies provisions relating to physician referrals to physical therapists

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2017-02-09HouseReferred: Professional Registration and Licensing(H)
2017-01-05HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-01-04HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback