MO HB429 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-02-23 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits requiring peace officers to issue a specific number of citations within a designated period of time
Title
Prohibits requiring peace officers to issue a specific number of citations within a designated period of time
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Public Hearing Completed (H) |
2015-01-21 | House | Referred: Public Safety and Emergency Preparedness(H) |
2015-01-12 | House | Read Second Time (H) |
2015-01-08 | House | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB429&year=2015&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills151/billpdf/intro/HB0429I.PDF |