MO HB429 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-17 - Placed on Informal Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Changes the laws regarding the issuance of salvage motor vehicle titles to insurers who purchase motor vehicles through the claims adjustment process

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changes the laws regarding the issuance of salvage motor vehicle titles to insurers who purchase motor vehicles through the claims adjustment process

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-17SenatePlaced on Informal Calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported Do Pass (S)
2013-04-16SenateExecutive Session Held (S) - Voted Do Pass
2013-04-16SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2013-04-11SenatePublic Hearing Scheduled (S) - TUESDAY, APRIL 16, 2013, 12:00PM, SCR 1
2013-04-04SenateSecond read and referred: Senate Small Business, Insurance, and Industry(S)
2013-04-03HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2013-04-02HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 147 NOES: 7
2013-04-02HouseTaken Up for Third Reading (H)
2013-03-28HousePerfected by Consent - Pursuant to House Rules (H)
2013-03-14HouseRules - Reported Do Pass - Consent (H)
2013-03-14HouseRules - Voted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2013-03-14HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-03-04HouseRules - No Action Taken (H)
2013-03-04HouseRules - Executive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-27HouseReferred: Rules(H)
2013-02-27HouseReported Do Pass by Consent (H)
2013-02-26HouseVoted Do Pass - Consent (H)
2013-02-26HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2013-02-12HousePublic Hearing Completed (H)
2013-02-07HouseReferred: Transportation(H)
2013-02-06HouseRead Second Time (H)
2013-02-05HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback