MO HB4 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-30 - Delivered to Secretary of State (G)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Revenue and Department of Transportation

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Appropriates money for the expenses, grants, refunds, and distributions of the Department of Revenue and Department of Transportation

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 4 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 117 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - House: HB 4 BILLS IN CONFERENCE (Y: 115 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: HB 4 HABs FOR THIRD READING (Y: 123 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: HB 4 (*HA 1) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 44 N: 104 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2017-04-04 - House - House: HB 4 (*HA 3) HABs FOR PERFECTION (Y: 72 N: 81 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-30HouseDelivered to Secretary of State (G)
2017-06-30HouseApproved by Governor (G)
2017-05-22HouseDelivered to Governor
2017-05-22HouseSigned by President Pro Tem (S)
2017-05-22HouseSigned by House Speaker(H)
2017-05-04HouseSenate Message (S)
2017-05-04HouseTruly Agreed To and Finally Passed - AYES: 31 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-05-04HouseSenate Adopts Conference Committee Report (S) - AYES: 31 NOES: 2 PRESENT: 0
2017-05-04HouseTaken Up
2017-05-04HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-05-04HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 115 NOES: 38 PRESENT: 0
2017-05-04HouseHouse Adopts Conference Committee Report (H) - AYES: 117 NOES: 39 PRESENT: 0
2017-05-04HouseTaken Up
2017-05-03HouseHouse Distributes Conference Committee Report (H)
2017-05-01HouseSenate Message (S)
2017-05-01HouseSenate Conference Committee Appointed (S) - SENATORS BROWN, SATER, WALLINGFORD, CURLS, HOLSMAN
2017-05-01HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-04-27HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed (H) - REPRESENTATIVES FITZPATRICK, ALFERMAN, CONWAY(104), BUTLER, KENDRICK
2017-04-27HouseSenate Message (S)
2017-04-27HouseSenate Refuses to Recede, Grants Conference (S)
2017-04-26HouseHouse Message (H)
2017-04-26HouseHouse Refuses to Adopt, Requests Senate to Recede or Grant Conference - SCS
2017-04-26HouseTaken Up
2017-04-25SenateReported to the House with... (H) - SCS
2017-04-25SenateThird Read and Passed (S) - AYES: 32 NOES: 1 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-25SenateSCS Adopted (S)
2017-04-25SenateTaken Up
2017-04-24SenateSCS Reported Do Pass (S)
2017-04-20SenateSCS Voted Do Pass (S)
2017-04-20SenateExecutive Session Held (S)
2017-04-19SenatePublic Hearing Held (S)
2017-04-13SenatePublic Hearing Continued (S) - Wednesday, April 19, 2017, 8:30am, SCR 2
2017-04-06HouseReported to the Senate and First Read (S)
2017-04-06HouseThird Read and Passed (H) - AYES: 123 NOES: 30 PRESENT: 0
2017-04-06HouseTaken Up
2017-04-04HousePerfected (H)
2017-04-04HouseHCS Adopted (H)
2017-04-04HouseTitle of Bill - Agreed To
2017-04-04HouseTaken Up
2017-04-04HouseLaid Over (H)
2017-04-04HouseTaken Up
2017-04-04HouseSEE COMMENTS - Six (6) hours total debate on perfection, pursuant to HR 1400
2017-04-03HouseLaid Over (H)
2017-04-03HouseTaken Up
2017-03-29HouseHCS Reported Do Pass (H) - AYES: 32 NOES: 0 PRESENT: 0
2017-03-28HouseHCS Voted Do Pass (H)
2017-03-28HouseExecutive Session Completed (H)
2017-02-23HouseReferred: Budget(H)
2017-02-22HouseRead Second Time (H)
2017-02-21HouseIntroduced and Read First Time (H)

Missouri State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.house.mo.gov/Bill.aspx?bill=HB4&year=2017&code=R
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0004H.01I.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0004H.03C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0004H.03P.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0004S.04C.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0004H.05S.pdf
Texthttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/hlrbillspdf/0004H.05T.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/050.006.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/050.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/052.005.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.senate.mo.gov/17info/Journals/RDay590425971-1055.pdf#1038
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/068.009.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills171/rollcalls/068.008.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback