MO HB395 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-02-28 - Public Hearing Completed (H)
Pending: House Crime Prevention And Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the crime of operating a motorized vessel with excessive blood alcohol content when a person operates a motorized vessel on any navigable waterway with a blood alcohol content of .08 of 1% or more
Title
Creates the crime of operating a motorized vessel with excessive blood alcohol content when a person operates a motorized vessel on any navigable waterway with a blood alcohol content of .08 of 1% or more
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-28 | Public Hearing Completed (H) | |
2011-02-10 | Referred: Crime Prevention and Public Safety (H) | |
2011-02-03 | Read Second Time (H) | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced and Read First Time (H) |
Missouri State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.house.mo.gov/billsummary.aspx?bill=HB395&year=2011&code=R |
Text | https://www.house.mo.gov/billtracking/bills111/biltxt/intro/HB0395I.htm |